Financial history STYLE FOR SOLDIERS

Charity Number: 1161119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £187.33k £50.60k £97.12k £122.06k £122.61k
Total expenditure £381.43k £148.22k £206.53k £177.30k £173.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A