Financial history CLOVERLEAFWORLD MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1160574
Charity reporting is overdue by 371 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.94k £19.25k £23.80k £39.05k £27.80k
Total expenditure £12.00k £21.83k £10.80k £39.10k £29.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A