TANSLEY CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance to elderly/infirm ladies living within the Coventry area. For the purposes of the Charity 'elderly' is deemed to be 50 years and over. Applications cannot be accepted for assistence with of Council Tax or Inland Revenue payments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 May 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Coventry City
Governance
- 12 August 1976: Standard registration
- 01 March 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1117345 HEART OF ENGLAND COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/05/2017 | 15/05/2018 | 15/05/2019 | 15/05/2020 | 15/05/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.41k | £5.20k | £3.33k | £3.70k | £2.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.38k | £1.62k | £0 | £465 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2020 | 12 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 15 May 2019 | 25 June 2020 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 1 JUNE 1981
Charitable objects
SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF THE EXPENSES AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY AGED OR INFIRM WOMEN RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF COVENTRY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH WOMEN. (SEE SCHEME FOR FURTHER DETAILS)
Area of benefit
CITY OF COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window