Financial history BRADFORD NORTH FOODBANK

Charity number: 1160060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.22k £127.36k £122.18k £158.24k £175.61k
Total expenditure £30.55k £50.78k £61.15k £129.92k £179.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.43k