Trustees BRADFORD NORTH FOODBANK
Charity number: 1160060

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Clare Gregory | Trustee | 18 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Teagan Robinson-Bell | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly May Baynham | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Louise Workman | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Callaghan | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Clymo | Trustee | 04 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Criddle | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Moira Crotty | Trustee | 13 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.