Financial history EMBRACING AGE

Charity number: 1160400
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £109.02k £89.07k £60.51k £192.69k £168.53k
Total expenditure £93.19k £75.21k £77.41k £108.26k £156.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A