ST JOHN & ST FRANCIS CHURCH SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1160174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We organise social events for both children and adults to raise money. These include discos, bingo and fairs. We also organise events that enhance the education of the children, for example design competitions and science fairs. The money we raise is used to purchase equipment or fund events to enhance the children's education and experiences.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £7,837
Total expenditure: £10,779

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • StJStf OSCAR (Working name)
  • ST J & ST F PTA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Shane Radford Trustee 15 September 2024
None on record
Michele Nicola Lewington Trustee 15 September 2024
None on record
Natasha Charlene Tottle Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.46k £6.11k £6.02k £6.10k £7.84k
Total expenditure £4.38k £4.62k £4.06k £6.01k £10.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 02 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 02 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. John & St. Francis Church Schoo
Westonzoyland Road
BRIDGWATER
TA6 5BP
Phone:
01278456918
Website:

stjohnstfrancisbwmat.org