Financial history TRINITY SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1163326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £394.99k £390.93k £392.65k £450.41k £461.32k
Total expenditure £383.05k £388.41k £399.25k £437.81k £475.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £38.52k £12.64k
Income from government grants N/A £9.17k £5.05k N/A N/A