Financial history THE STOPFORDIAN TRUST

Charity number: 505539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £18.89k £11.71k £11.24k £14.05k £16.44k
Total expenditure £20.90k £11.10k £16.94k £9.39k £19.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A