Financial history THE WOKINGHAM VOLUNTEER CENTRE

Charity number: 1161498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £129.44k £148.31k £157.80k £174.07k £177.12k
Total expenditure £135.11k £149.26k £153.15k £169.10k £173.87k
Income from government contracts N/A £90.38k £96.94k £86.83k £96.38k
Income from government grants £69.28k £10.53k £5.97k £4.57k £4.25k