Financial history BLUE STONE COLLABORATIVE

Charity number: 1161220
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £536.28k £316.97k £422.12k £293.26k £516.73k
Total expenditure £494.43k £186.72k £266.67k £302.22k £456.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £83.33k £312.02k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £6.64k N/A N/A N/A £5.99k
Income - Charitable activities £529.64k N/A N/A N/A £510.74k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £494.43k N/A N/A N/A £456.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A £1.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A £267.45k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A £0