Financial history Right to Succeed CIO

Charity number: 1160886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.05m £2.63m £2.48m £3.35m £5.87m
Total expenditure £1.17m £2.00m £2.59m £2.91m £4.50m
Income from government contracts N/A £50.10k £366.03k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.00k £20.67k £230.22k £981.49k £1.98m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.01m £2.58m £1.85m £711.16k £3.35m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £975 £0 £80.60k £0
Income - Charitable activities £34.00k £49.12k £596.24k £2.63m £2.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £888 £205 £1.58k £18.56k £58.61k
Income - Other £147 £51 £33.58k £316 £22.53k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £959.24k £1.79m £2.28m £2.63m £4.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £208.39k £215.54k £304.63k £272.63k £271.80k
Expenditure - Governance £56.74k £65.93k £126.46k £58.14k £83.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £352.69k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0