Trustees RICHMOND HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity number: 505630

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH MIDDLETON | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr EULASHINI CHUNTARPURSAT | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE ANN SHIELDS | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ANNE KEMP | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HANDY | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN JOHN TOWNEND | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MILNER | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ARGYRO WEST | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gary Paul Woods | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Moran | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Julian Fox | Trustee | 26 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.