Accounts and annual returns CONGREGATION EZRA

Charity number: 1161576
Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 23 March 2025 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 152 days
Annual return 31 January 2023 23 March 2025 479 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 518 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 23 March 2025 844 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 883 days
Annual return 31 January 2021 23 March 2025 1209 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1248 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1613 days