Financial history TEAM MARGOT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160236
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £102.20k £53.30k £128.78k £39.87k £113.87k
Total expenditure £87.79k £98.27k £63.48k £78.26k £94.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.02k N/A N/A N/A