FRIENDS OF HIGHGATE LIBRARY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in Highgate by providing, or assisting in the provision of a public library and associated services including, but not limited to, information and study facilities, educational programmes, courses, classes and lectures. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities at Highgate Library and Highgate Library Civic and Cultural Centre for meetings, classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- 11 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA LEFEVRE | Chair | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Harris | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Patrick Lefevre | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Anstiss | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARGOT RUTH KAFNO BA | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HARRISON | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
AGNES STEWART | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE COHEN MA, PHD | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Kerridge | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.58k | £1.64k | £13.90k | £11.14k | £8.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.68k | £1.17k | £13.27k | £8.56k | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.83k | N/A | £9.75k | £2.62k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HIGHGATE BY PROVIDING, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF, A PUBLIC LIBRARY AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, INFORMATION AND STUDY FACILITIES, EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, COURSES, CLASSES AND LECTURES. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AT THE HIGHGATE LIBRARY AND THE HIGHGATE LIBRARY CIVIC AND CULTURAL CENTRE FOR MEETINGS, CLASSES, LECTURES AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THOSE INDIVIDUALS LIVING AND WORKING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INDIVIDUALS. 3) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 LAURIER ROAD
LONDON
NW5 1SG
- Phone:
- 02074857305
- Email:
- secretary@fohlcf.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window