Financial history AllChild

Charity number: 1160947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.10m £4.42m £5.81m £6.59m £7.61m
Total expenditure £4.11m £4.06m £5.03m £6.50m £7.77m
Income from government contracts £735.06k £354.34k £2.15m £1.83m £2.09m
Income from government grants £393.50k £472.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.06m £3.19m £2.89m £3.64m £4.41m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.03m £1.22m £2.92m £2.93m £3.05m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.28k £256 £356 £24.15k £149.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.73m £3.75m £4.48m £5.80m £6.45m
Expenditure - Raising funds £379.20k £308.34k £548.03k £704.79k £1.32m
Expenditure - Governance £121.09k £63.46k £68.55k £79.99k £8.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0