IN CHARLEY'S MEMORY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In Charley's Memory currently offers counselling to young people aged 11 -25, recently launching the overs service, now offering counselling to all. Based at our offices in Highbridge. 1 mile from the M5, and walking distance to bus and rail links
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £100,250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 March 2015: Standard registration
- ICM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Millier | Chair | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Symonds | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rob Fountain Mr | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Shillaker | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS STEVEN PLUME | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE REEVES | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.60k | £102.00k | £162.00k | £258.01k | £299.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.88k | £76.00k | £128.00k | £250.93k | £293.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £129.16k | £100.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 03/03/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG ADULTS AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS EFFECTING YOUNG ADULTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - RAISING THE PROFILE OF MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS THROUGH SOCIAL MEDIA, WEBSITE, FORUMS AND VISITS TO SCHOOLS/COLLEGES; - PROVIDING YOUNG ADULTS AND THEIR FAMILIES A SAFE HAVEN WITH RELEVANT PROFESSIONALS AND AUTHORITIES; AND - PROVIDING SUPPORT NETWORKS FOR YOUNG ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
In Charley's Memory
Unit 6
Brue Way
HIGHBRIDGE
Somerset
TA9 4AW
- Phone:
- 01278557490
- Email:
- ceo@incharleysmemory.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window