Financial history CITY CATERING SOUTHAMPTON

Charity number: 1160776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.98m £4.19m £5.39m £5.45m £5.50m
Total expenditure £5.06m £4.47m £5.41m £5.42m £5.29m
Income from government contracts £109.50k £3.16m £4.83m £4.60m £5.41m
Income from government grants £7.90k £647.47k £159.93k £151.22k £8.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £180.71k £137.81k £151.20k £94.27k
Income - Other trading activities £147.73k £108.91k £114.99k £117.40k £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.84m £3.16m £4.83m £5.05m £5.41m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £53 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £743.45k £314.46k £131.22k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.96m £4.43m £5.38m £5.36m £5.29m
Expenditure - Raising funds £102.40k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.20k £17.33k £39.89k £34.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £40.97k £33.57k £62.32k £0