Financial history DERBYSHIRE LANDSKILLS

Charity number: 505745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £58.59k £77.10k £112.10k £112.49k £96.36k
Total expenditure £66.89k £69.35k £115.92k £118.13k £96.25k
Income from government contracts £1.16k N/A £6.49k £4.11k £8.21k
Income from government grants N/A £1.50k N/A N/A N/A