Governing document DERBYSHIRE LANDSKILLS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/09/1971 AS AMENDED ON 03/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 01/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR LAND BASED EMPLOYMENT WITHIN DERBYSHIRE AND SURROUNDING GEOGRAPHICAL AREA BY: SUPPORTING OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN MAINTAINING STANDARDS, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH VERIFICATION; FACILITATING THE RECRUITMENT AND TRAINING OF VERIFIERS FOR QUALIFICATIONS RELATED TO LAND BASED WORK; AND LIAISING WITH OTHER TRAINING AND EDUCATION PROVIDERS WITH A VIEW TO ENHANCING THE OPPORTUNITIES THAT EXIST FOR QUALITY EDUCATION AND TRAINING.
Area of benefit
DERBYSHIRE AND SURROUNDING GEOGRAPHICAL AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.