Financial history FOXWOOD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1162275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £29.28k £22.09k £15.79k £21.44k £17.87k
Total expenditure £34.34k £16.17k £18.00k £29.63k £17.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £4.00k N/A
Income from government grants £23.43k £9.33k N/A £750 £840