Financial history BRS EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1161555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.46m £3.48m £4.44m £4.48m £5.30m
Total expenditure £3.86m £4.03m £4.67m £5.08m £5.30m
Income from government contracts £1.15m £1.05m £1.26m £1.17m £1.27m
Income from government grants £57.55k £14.36k N/A N/A £25.40k
Income - Donations and legacies £421.40k £335.54k £565.40k £536.34k £974.99k
Income - Other trading activities £158.56k £75.37k £99.96k £144.60k £167.34k
Income - Charitable activities £2.67m £2.81m £3.46m £3.46m £3.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45.84k £40.47k £39.94k £52.50k £52.75k
Income - Other £159.99k £215.48k £270.37k £294.40k £269.92k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.60m £3.87m £4.52m £4.91m £5.14m
Expenditure - Raising funds £255.43k £137.06k £122.82k £43.92k £43.85k
Expenditure - Governance £24.06k £25.60k £24.27k £39.33k £41.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £16.52k £16.02k £16.21k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.89k £24.27k £22.14k £118.11k £113.46k