ZIMBABWE PARTNERSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ZPT supports beneficiary churches in Zimbabwe in their ministry and mission by providing theological training, supplying bibles and support with education and health needs. We also seek to relieve poverty amongst beneficiary churches and their wider communities. In 2024 we launched a special appeal for funds to address the current famine conditions being experienced as a result of the drought.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 09 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER HENRY WILLIAM BOYES | Chair | 12 July 2011 |
|
|||||
Shaun Harold Hexter | Trustee | 18 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ian Drury | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|||||
MACIEK MARK STOLARSKI | Trustee | 13 April 2013 |
|
|||||
DEREK FRENCH | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN CARSON SPALDING | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
STUART MOFFATT | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND POUNTNEY | Trustee | 12 July 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.93k | £75.75k | £84.28k | £79.97k | £108.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.88k | £67.54k | £82.07k | £110.79k | £69.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07/12/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE 1.THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH BY ASSISTING BENEFICIARY CHURCHES, AND BENEFICIARIES, TO EVANGELISE, TEACH AND PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH EFFECTIVELY AND CONSISTENTLY IN AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARY CHURCHES' COMMUNITIES, BY MEANS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF - PROVIDING THEOLOGICAL TEACHING AND TRAINING (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, ON MATTERS OF DOCTRINE AND CHURCH AND PASTORAL PRACTICE) FOR BENEFICIARY CHURCHES AND BENEFICIARIES - PROVIDING SUCH INCIDENTAL PRACTICAL AND MATERIAL SUPPORT TO BENEFICIARY CHURCHES AND BENEFICIARIES AS THE TRUSTEES JUDGE REASONABLY NECESSARY TO THIS END. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST BENEFICIARY CHURCHES, BENEFICIARIES AND THE BENEFICIARY CHURCHES' WIDER COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 HAVANT ROAD
LONDON
E17 3JE
- Phone:
- 07981751388
- Email:
- theTrustees@zpt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window