Financial history NEVILL HOLT COMMUNITY ARTS

Charity number: 1163614
Charity reporting is up to date (305 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £454.41k £189.21k £1.15m £1.05m £710.93k
Total expenditure £479.41k £189.21k £1.44m £1.58m £1.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £111.14k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £489.33k £383.99k £312.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £389.45k £464.00k £215.07k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £269.13k £207.00k £183.50k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.09m £1.49m £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £66.49k £86.69k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £0 £36.26k £21.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £286.52k £0 £0