HEARTBEAT CHORUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEARTBEAT CHORUS IS A LADIES' A CAPPELLA CHORUS SPECIALISING IN LADIES' BARBERSHOP STYLE SINGING. WE AIM TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF A CAPPELLA SINGING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS. WE SING A WIDE RANGE OF MUSIC, MAINLY UNACCOMPANIED BUT ON OCCASIONS WITH ACCOMPANIMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
Governance
- 26 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Marshall | Chair | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
RUTH DRURY | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Viv Worsley | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Christine Moreton | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ISOBEL CURRIE | Trustee | 09 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.58k | £33.62k | £28.60k | £32.93k | £34.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.31k | £16.33k | £8.75k | £31.32k | £31.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 APR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUN 2016 as amended on 25 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF 'A CAPPELLA' SINGING IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS; TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Beaminster Avenue
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK4 3HU
- Phone:
- 07899695691
- Email:
- contact@heartbeatchorus.com
- Website:
-
WWW.HEARTBEATCHORUS.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window