Financial history THE BURNS PRICE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.89k £10.39k £3.64k £203 £20.00k
Total expenditure £25.81k £18.36k £647 £18.27k £8.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A