Financial history RENEWED HOPE TRUST

Charity number: 1161502
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £236.94k £140.55k £119.74k £225.81k £215.14k
Total expenditure £151.23k £131.22k £150.96k £158.25k £203.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.87k £23.60k £24.13k £4.57k £5.00k