Financial history GOOD THINGS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1165209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £17.07m £18.14m £8.89m £9.68m £8.88m
Total expenditure £17.54m £17.73m £9.68m £9.00m £10.06m
Income from government contracts £1.57m £5.20m £106.74k N/A £37.49k
Income from government grants £4.13m £4.77m £5.49m £2.39m £885.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £12.69m £14.25m £8.88m £9.60m £8.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £20.88k £7.88k £11.19k £82.38k £154.35k
Income - Other £4.37m £3.88m £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £17.54m £17.73m £9.68m £9.00m £10.06m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £38.82k £29.81k £24.43k £25.06k £35.51k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £5.33m £4.25m £4.84m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0