Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST KATHARINE'S CHURCH ICKLEFORD

Charity Number: 1164576
Charity reporting is overdue by 1450 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 354 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 354 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 720 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 720 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1085 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1085 days
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1450 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1450 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 20 March 2021 293 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required