Financial history LICHFIELD FOODBANK

Charity number: 1162359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £74.96k £67.26k £152.31k £151.79k £202.10k
Total expenditure £35.92k £64.57k £111.96k £163.26k £144.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £240 £1.30k £1.00k £1.20k