Financial history BASSETLAW LEARNING DISABILITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.60k £1.34k £17.64k £25.65k £19.48k
Total expenditure £35.61k £12.60k £23.65k £17.01k £18.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A