Financial history HOLDING FORTH THE WORD

Charity number: 1164181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £220.37k £215.67k £167.32k £215.48k £416.02k
Total expenditure £169.09k £134.65k £148.50k £174.24k £418.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.72k N/A £8.39k N/A N/A