SARUM COLLEGE

Charity number: 1161253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sarum College is an ecumenical study, conference and research centre. Our educational programme is organised in seven Sarum Centres of Learning. These Centres offer a variety of courses within our specialist areas of Christian Spirituality, Leadership, Ministry, Liturgy and Worship, Theology, Imagination and Culture and The Arts. Within the college is a bookshop and library.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 September 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Rachel Ann Bending Trustee 04 December 2024
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
LUCY ELIZABETH SALISBURY Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Revd Canon Angela Karen Nutt Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Rev Christine Mary Smith Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
The Revd Canon Professor Elizabeth Bridget Stuart Trustee 01 July 2023
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY TRINITY AND OF SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL AND OF SAINT SWITHUN OF WINCHESTER
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, WINCHESTER
Received: On time
Rt Revd Noel Michael Roy Beasley Trustee 29 June 2023
THE BATH AND WELLS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
THE PALACE TRUST
Received: On time
ANGLICAN ALLIANCE
Received: On time
Rt Revd Stephen David Lake Trustee 23 June 2022
SOWTER CLERICAL LIBRARY
Received: On time
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND
Received: On time
SARUM ST MICHAEL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
Received: On time
The Venerable Dr Chigor Chike Trustee 25 March 2021
RIGHTS AND EQUALITIES IN NEWHAM
Received: On time
THE UNITED SOCIETY
Received: On time
THAMESMEAD CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Timothy James Mynott Trustee 01 July 2019
NFS MEDIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Emma Charlotte Osborne Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Sir Marcus James O'Lone Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
THE RT REVD DR ALASTAIR LLEWELLYN JOHN REDFERN Trustee 01 July 2018
None on record
DOM SIMON JAMES KEIR JARRATT Trustee 01 July 2018
THE PERSHORE NASHDOM AND ELMORE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.68m £1.42m £1.51m £1.85m £2.10m
Total expenditure £1.75m £1.26m £1.62m £1.83m £2.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £136.09k £317.00k £93.38k £172.71k £248.79k
Income - Other trading activities £411.27k £103.48k £442.26k £725.77k £732.75k
Income - Charitable activities £1.13m £864.26k £960.82k £946.36k £1.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.87k £8.18k £8.72k £8.62k £8.65k
Income - Other £0 £126.01k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £50.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.45m £1.14m £1.26m £1.29m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £294.65k £114.56k £359.74k £538.25k £568.40k
Expenditure - Governance £9.70k £11.79k £11.79k £6.28k £8.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £1.44m £1.39m £1.38m £1.39m £1.37m
Long-term investments £451.51k £524.61k £503.41k £526.30k £578.56k
Other assets £769.10k £1.14m £1.05m £849.70k £1.03m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £367.03k £516.94k £540.93k £327.31k £443.38k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 19 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 26 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 DECEMBER 1928, AND SCHEMES OF 19 JUNE 1958 AND 6 MAY 1982
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES FOR PUPILS AT THE COLLEGE. 2) GENERALLY PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ATTENDING THE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 20 September 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SARUM COLLEGE
19 THE CLOSE
SALISBURY
SP1 2EE
Phone:
01722424800