Financial history CROSSLIGHT ADVICE

Charity Number: 1163306
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £440.49k £530.84k £727.22k £682.89k £829.06k
Total expenditure £314.33k £470.83k £640.40k £655.22k £776.82k
Income from government contracts £35.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £35.00k £137.85k £93.08k £200.71k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £492.13k £578.32k £569.01k £685.99k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £143.57k £113.88k £143.06k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £38.71k £5.32k £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £426.96k £593.64k £585.05k £704.34k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £43.87k £46.75k £70.16k £72.48k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £19.30k £114.99k £83.33k £139.25k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0