Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, WOODSTOCK

Charity number: 1164329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £98.33k £109.67k £167.14k £177.16k £167.19k
Total expenditure £95.88k £113.18k £125.31k £134.90k £134.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.24k £2.00k N/A N/A