Financial history THE CHESTER ST CECILIA SINGERS

Charity number: 506189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.47k £180 £1.16k £2.43k £2.94k
Total expenditure £5.54k £1.64k £1.71k £2.60k £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A