Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST PETERS AND PAUL’S CHURCH, WATER ORTON

Charity Number: 1162288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £181.75k £209.89k £152.49k £171.21k £195.46k
Total expenditure £184.89k £169.02k £155.13k £181.22k £189.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £31.08k £10.33k N/A £1.20k N/A