Financial history THE ALEXANDRA SALES TRUST

Charity number: 1161811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.02k £23.95k £43.33k £30.92k £31.47k
Total expenditure £54.02k £20.08k £20.58k £28.58k £26.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A