Financial history RACE AGAINST BLOOD CANCER

Charity Number: 1162696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.55k £55.17k £21.92k £25.17k £43.24k
Total expenditure £63.06k £34.38k £26.62k £50.06k £59.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.34k £9.41k N/A N/A