Financial history DROITWICH METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1163089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £117.64k £115.08k £129.01k £134.22k £162.93k
Total expenditure £133.29k £142.43k £137.92k £135.94k £159.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.00k