Financial history KINGDOM INFLUENCE ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1165376
Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £315 £0 £0 £391 £10.50k
Total expenditure £315 £0 £0 £391 £8.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A