Financial history DRAKE CALLEJA TRUST

Charity Number: 1164114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £251.63k £112.97k £187.98k £119.25k £279.79k
Total expenditure £263.57k £128.37k £223.52k £243.56k £178.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A