Financial history GREATER EUROPE MISSION UK

Charity number: 1162468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £142.85k £138.53k £413.20k £542.89k £531.56k
Total expenditure £141.15k £124.03k £403.10k £465.70k £518.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £486.96k £505.86k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £55.22k £22.35k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.36k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £714 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £465.70k £517.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £790
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £5.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0