MAC BEVAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mac Bevan offers grants and financial support to small scale, non profit organisations and charities. The charities supported by MBCT are 0 admin and provide evidence of all charitable work carried out. MBCT makes charity donations to organisations who: support to eradicate poverty assist with education provide medical intervention advance healthcare support disaster relief
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Pakistan
- South Africa
Governance
- 13 August 2015: Standard registration
- MBCT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WASIM REHMAN | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Silvie Tonellotto | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Idnan Yunas | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
FAZAL REHMAN | Trustee | 23 May 2015 |
|
|
||||||
SHAREEN ELLAHI | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.19k | £116.39k | £114.27k | £74.35k | £703 | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.08k | £123.73k | £91.21k | £107.57k | £221.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27/04/2015 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/07/2015
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHER CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO CHARITIES AND ORGANISATIONS WHO PROVIDE HELP FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 Constantine Way
Bilston
WV14 8GU
- Phone:
- 07838184615
- Email:
- info@macbevan-ct.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window