Financial history FRIENDS OF COMBE VALLEY

Charity number: 1163581
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.07k £11.88k £12.00k £5.99k £8.82k
Total expenditure £1.48k £6.04k £16.75k £8.75k £6.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.23k