PANAVIA TORNADO PRESERVATION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the operational/engineering aspects of the Panavia Tornado aircraft and its place in UK aviation history through the provision of a museum for its display and to exhibit documents, items, artefacts and other materials related to the Tornado; and to preserve and protect the Panavia Tornado aircraft for the benefit of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 19 August 2015: CIO registration
- PTPG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELLIOTT ATKINS | Chair | 19 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Wilson | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Suckling | Trustee | 27 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Holland | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SWANSON | Trustee | 19 August 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £7.93k | £2.71k | £644 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £6.24k | £2.48k | £778 | £946 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE OPERATIONAL / ENGINEERING > ASPECTS OF THE PANAVIA TORNADO AIRCRAFT AND ITS PLACE IN UK AVIATION HISTORY > THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM FOR ITS DISPLAY AND TO EXHIBIT DOCUMENTS, > ITEMS, ARTEFACTS AND OTHER MATERIALS RELATED TO THE TORNADO; AND 2) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PANVIA TORNADO AIRCRAFT FOR THE BENEFIT OF > THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hangar 872
Aerospace Business Park
Picketston
Vale of Glamorgan
Wales
CF62 4QN
- Phone:
- 01162985239
- Email:
- enquiries@ptpg.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window