NORTH HARROW COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY SERVICE AND A COMMUNITY HUB FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF NORTH HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £67,231 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Harrow
Governance
- 29 June 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAMAL SOMCHAND SHAH | Chair | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Usha Prema | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Beverley-Ann Lury | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ramya Jegatheesan | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rehan Jaffer | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margareta Elizabeth Keane | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Teresa Mote | Trustee | 17 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Stephenson | Trustee | 17 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.14k | £98.87k | £121.42k | £98.24k | £96.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.20k | £80.72k | £68.55k | £80.29k | £78.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £45.00k | £75.00k | £113.70k | £68.00k | £67.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY SERVICE FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS OF NORTH HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (2) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH HARROW AND SURROUNDING COMMUNITIES (THE AREA OF BENEFIT), WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, RACE, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING WHEN APPROPRIATE TOGETHER THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, LOCAL SCHOOLS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR EDUCATION, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (3) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL - NORTH HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 EDWARD ROAD
HARROW
HA2 6QB
- Phone:
- 02084271252
- Email:
- Northharrowlibrary@gmail.com
- Website:
-
northharrowlibrary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window