THE KEMACH FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1164563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The goal of The Kemach Foundation is to increase the levels of Haredim in the Israeli workforce. Its objectives are achieved by individually addressing financial and academic challenges and facilitating job placement to confront critical issues of social mobility, equal access to higher education and workforce participation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leo Noe Chair 01 November 2015
RACHEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PROJECT S E E D
Received: On time
MIGUEL GERADO ABADI Trustee 30 January 2017
None on record
SIMON KANTER Trustee 19 June 2015
RACHEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DUCHENNE RESEARCH FUND
Received: On time
KANTER JULES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SIR MICHAEL LAWRENCE DAVIS Trustee 19 June 2015
THE PORTLAND TRUST
Received: On time
THE DAVIS FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £456.11k £488.91k £936.85k £730.94k £682.28k
Total expenditure £457.17k £486.10k £937.98k £730.86k £683.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £936.85k £730.94k £682.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £937.98k £730.86k £683.67k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £889 £127 £1.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £730.73k £682.08k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £12.74k £12.82k £11.43k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £960 £960 £960

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 15 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 23 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Second Floor
The Hide
3 Kingly Court
London
W1B 5PW
Phone:
020 7846 3054