Financial history BRIGHTONSOUP

Charity number: 1162898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.52k £879 £8.29k £23.86k £18.53k
Total expenditure £4.74k £1.06k £4.75k £15.48k £15.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.00k £2.00k N/A